Name | Everton Leandro dos Santos Pinto |
---|---|
Citizenship | Brazil |
Age | 37 (1986-10-14) |
Height | 176 cm |
Foot | Right foot |
Value | 270,000 euros |
Current club | |
Team | Figue Ellence |
---|---|
Pos. | Striker |
Date(EOC) | 2016-12-31 |
Citizenship | Brazil |
---|---|
Age | 37 (1986-10-14) |
Height | 176 cm |
Foot | Right foot |
Value | 270,000 euros |
Current club | |
Team | Figue Ellence |
Pos. | Striker |
Date(EOC) | 2016-12-31 |
1st R | SUB | PEN | RC | YC | OT | GR(FC) | BMP | RTG | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AP | G | AP | G | AP | Ab | ||||||
7 | 0 | 11 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 1.39 | 1.53 | 0 | 6.1 |
Date | EOC | Left | Joined | Fee | Type |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2005-01-01 | 2006-01-01 | St Andrea U20 | SanTo André | Own | |
2006-01-01 | 2007-01-01 | SanTo André | Bragantino RB | Free transfers | |
2007-01-01 | 2008-01-01 | Bragantino RB | Corinthians | Own | |
2008-01-01 | 2008-07-01 | Corinthians | Paris Saint-Germain | £1.8 million | Own |
2008-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | Paris Saint-Germain | Fluminensee | rent | |
2009-06-30 | 2009-07-01 | Fluminensee | Paris Saint-Germain | End of lending | |
2009-07-01 | 2009-12-01 | Paris Saint-Germain | Niigata Swan | rent | |
2009-12-01 | 2010-02-01 | Niigata Swan | Paris Saint-Germain | End of lending | |
2010-02-01 | 2010-12-01 | Paris Saint-Germain | Goias | rent | |
2010-12-01 | 2011-01-01 | Goias | Paris Saint-Germain | End of lending | |
2011-01-01 | 2011-02-01 | Paris Saint-Germain | Ponte preta | rent | |
2011-02-01 | 2011-03-01 | Ponte preta | Paris Saint-Germain | End of lending | |
2011-03-01 | 2011-12-01 | Paris Saint-Germain | Seongnam Football Club | rent | |
2011-12-01 | 2012-01-01 | Seongnam Football Club | Paris Saint-Germain | End of lending | |
2012-01-01 | 2013-02-01 | Paris Saint-Germain | Seongnam Football Club | Free transfers | |
2013-02-01 | 2013-10-01 | Seongnam Football Club | Ponte preta | Free transfers | |
2013-10-01 | 2014-07-17 | Ponte preta | Figue Ellence | Own | |
2014-07-17 | 2015-07-28 | Figue Ellence | FC Seoul | Own | |
2015-07-28 | 2016-01-01 | FC Seoul | Ulsan modern | Free transfers | |
2016-01-01 | 2017-01-23 | Ulsan modern | Figue Ellence | Own | |
2017-01-23 | 2017-08-03 | Figue Ellence | Holy Cross | Free transfers | |
2017-08-03 | 2018-05-15 | Holy Cross | Mumbai City | Own | |
2018-05-15 | 2018-08-28 | Mumbai City | Preserve flower high SP | Own | |
2018-08-28 | 2019-08-28 | Preserve flower high SP | Kolkata Athletic | Own | |
2019-08-28 | Kolkata Athletic | Figue Ellence | Free transfers |